Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Smith, James D, Ii, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Sanders, Christine, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ - Execution | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service NORI |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Restitution Issued | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court
Judge: Queen, Amy M |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Brown, Jennifer J |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Restitution Issued | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order - Trial
Judge: Williams, Wes |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Landlord/Tenant
Judge: Landlord Tenant, Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.