Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Henkel, David, Henkel, Jennifer, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Thayer, Jeffrey Paul, against Boys & Girls Club Of Salem, Marion & Polk Counties, Inc., Nw Performance And Training Llc, represented by Sweitzer, Graham M, Trautman, Jeffrey A, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with David E. Leith presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2023 |
CategoryTort - General |
Last RefreshedFebruary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2024 |
Hearing - Status Check Remote via Teams - Phone: 1-971-323-0609 - Conference ID: 522 944 097# Judge: Queen, Amy M |
||
February 28, 2024 |
Hearing - Status Check Remote via Teams - Phone: 1-971-323-0609 - Conference ID: 998 284 387# Judge: Queen, Amy M |
||
February 07, 2024 |
Hearing - Status Check Remote via Teams - Phone: 1-971-323-0609 - Conference ID: 155 949 767# Judge: Queen, Amy M |
||
January 02, 2024 |
Hearing - Status Check Via teams remote 1-971-323-0609 ID 250 725 800# Judge: Queen, Amy M |
||
October 23, 2023 | Answer | ||
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check Remote via Teams - Phone: 1-971-323-0609 - Conference ID: 691 448 498# Judge: Queen, Amy M |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 91 Day | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order reassigning to AMQ Judge: Prall, Tracy A |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof - Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.