Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Miller, Donald, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Farley, Byron Thomas, against Johnson, Angela, represented by Moisan, Jane L, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with J. Channing Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims - General |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Closed | ||
October 05, 2023 | Notice - Judgment Entry | ||
October 05, 2023 |
Judgment GJ DISMISSAL: STIPULATED Judge: Bennett, J Channing |
||
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court Bench Trial will be heard with jury trial; Notice sent. Judge: Bennett, J Channing |
|
September 07, 2023 |
Notes - Correspondence Email re: settlement; closing docs in 14D |
||
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Pre-Trial Conference IN PERSON: Counsel shall appear in person; Everything is due- Copies to court 1 week in advance of this date; SFT 9/12/23- Bench Trial; Dates set with counsel; Notice sent. Judge: Bennett, J Channing |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Case Management IN PERSON: Tracking; Will be tried with lead case 21CV42782; Date set with counsel; Notice sent. Judge: Bennett, J Channing |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notes - Correspondence Blue Sheet |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check Counsel via phone: they initiate to court at 503.588.7950 with both attorneys on same line; Deadline for confirming witnesses & briefing schedule will be set today; Date set with counsel; Notice sent. Judge: Bennett, J Channing |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check Counsel via phone: they initiate to court at 503.588.7950 with both attorneys on same line; Third status- Court expects Depos/Disc to be done; TL will be set; Date set with counsel; Notice sent. Judge: Bennett, J Channing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.