Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Anderson, Carli Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Anderson, Kenneth Richard, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Jodie A. Bureta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 |
Hearing - Modification Reset from 3/19/24 Judge: Bureta, Jodie |
||
March 25, 2024 | Memorandum | ||
March 19, 2024 |
Hearing - Modification
Judge: Bureta, Jodie |
||
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court
Judge: Bureta, Jodie |
|
March 18, 2024 | Declaration - Uniform Support | ||
March 18, 2024 | Memorandum - Trial | ||
March 18, 2024 | Memorandum - At Law | ||
March 15, 2024 | Declaration | ||
March 15, 2024 |
Order - Telephone Testimony
Judge: Bureta, Jodie |
||
March 15, 2024 | Motion - Telephone Testimony |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.