Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
State Of Oregon, Dcs, Luna, Anthony Boue, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Rock, Elizabeth Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryPetition Custody/Support/Visitation |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Parenting Time Enforcement
Judge: Leith, David E |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service Facebook & Text 11/17/22 |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Return - Mail | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Enforce Parenting Time
Judge: Leith, David E |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Allow Alternative Service Judge: Leith, David E |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Filing of CIF | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Application - Fee Deferral Waiver | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion alternative service and declaration in support |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Fee Waiver DRP1- $56/Waived Judge: Authority, Administrative |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion - Enforce Parenting Time Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.