Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sebastian, Dorothy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Thayer, Jeffrey Paul, against Christensen, Ryan J., National General Insurance Online, Inc., represented by Evans, Jason P, Staggs, Tyler Evan, Wilson, Cliff J, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with James C. Edmonds presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryTort - General |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial - Twelve Person Jury ***40 jurors requested*** Trial fees paid? (715 days) Judge: Edmonds, James C |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Pre-Trial Conference (693 days) Via telephone; Court will initiate call; trial fees paid? Judge: Edmonds, James C |
|
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Closed | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Edmonds, James C |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Edmonds, James C |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Settlement Conference IN PERSON: Memos & Fees to be submitted by 10a of 5.12.22 or date will be cancelled; Date set with counsel; Notice sent. Judge: Bennett, J Channing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.