Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Beyer, Katherine L., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Norris, Gary G, against Auric Solar Llc, Caul, Scott C, represented by Raman, Anna S, Reinert, Gregory A, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2020 |
CategoryTort - General |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check YOU MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY PHONE BY CALLING THE COURT AT 1-971-323-0609 CONFERENCE ID:781 507 506# Judge: Partridge, Lindsay R |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check YOU MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY PHONE BY CALLING THE COURT AT 1-971-323-0609 CONFERENCE ID: 878 042 560# Judge: Partridge, Lindsay R |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notes - Correspondence | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notes - Correspondence | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check YOU MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY PHONE BY CALLING THE COURT AT 1-971-323-0609 CONFERENCE ID:371 757 379# Judge: Partridge, Lindsay R |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check YOU MAY APPEAR IN PERSON OR BY PHONE BY CALLING THE COURT AT 1-971-323-0609 CONFERENCE ID: 371 757 379# Judge: Partridge, Lindsay R |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check THIS WILL BE A TELEPHONIC HEARING. PLEASE CALL THE COURT AT 1-971-323-0609 CONFERENCE ID:856 698 701# Judge: Partridge, Lindsay R |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notes - Correspondence | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notes - Correspondence | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check THIS WILL BE A TELEPHONIC HEARING. PLEASE CALL THE COURT AT 1-971-323-0609 CONFERENCE ID:373 958 524# Judge: Partridge, Lindsay R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.