Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kirbycon, Llc, Dba Mckenzie Farms, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Reynolds, Daniel S, Sutton, Randall P, against Western Helicopter Services, Inc., represented by Hansen, Ryan T, Larson, Arnold Drew, Smith, Samuel T, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Sean E. Armstrong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 2020 |
CategoryTort - General |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2023 | Closed | ||
August 31, 2023 | Notice - Judgment Entry | ||
August 31, 2023 |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Armstrong, Sean E |
||
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court
Judge: Armstrong, Sean E |
|
July 21, 2023 |
Order
Judge: Armstrong, Sean E |
||
July 21, 2023 |
Notice - Dismissal Settlement |
||
July 18, 2023 | Motion - Telephone Testimony | ||
July 14, 2023 | Declaration | ||
July 14, 2023 | Response | ||
July 14, 2023 |
Response Correction |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.