Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Aylworth, Matthew R, Jennings, Taylor K, against Eskelsen, Tabitha, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Manuel Perez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeManuel Perez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Garnishees Response | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Default
Judge: Perez, Manuel |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Perez, Manuel |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Closed | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Statement - Costs & Disbursement | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion - Default Order | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.