Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Second Round Sub, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Johannes, Randall D, against Spencer, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Closed | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document DISMISSAL Judge: Morse, Diane M |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 63 Day | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Rule 7 Service Postponement Granted
Judge: Perez, Manuel |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion - Continue as Pending Case | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 91 Day | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Return - Service (Not Served) | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.