Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Orem, Joshua R, against Sioda, Norman, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Closed | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Morse, Diane M |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 91 Day | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 91 Day | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof - Service | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.