Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anderson, Jonathan D, against Berry, Niki, in the jurisdiction of Marion County, OR, . Marion County, OR Superior Courts with Tracy A. Prall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTracy A. Prall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMarion County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Closed | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Prall, Tracy A |
|
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 63 Day | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Rule 7 Service Postponement Granted
Judge: Klapstein, Janet A |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion - Continue as Pending Case | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 63 Day | |
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Change of Venue to Marion County Judge: Gerking, Timothy |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion - Change Venue | |
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order - Rule 7 Service Postponement Granted
Judge: Hoppe, David G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.