Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kincheloe, Charles Wesley, filed a(n) Post Conviction Relief case against Miller, Jamie, represented by Bennett, Erin E, in the jurisdiction of Malheur County, OR, . Malheur County, OR Superior Courts with J. Burdette Pratt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2022 |
CategoryPost Conviction Relief |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMalheur County, OR |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court SRCI sid # 21459436 VIA WEBEX MOUNTAIN TIME - 30 Min Judge: Pratt, J Burdette |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Trial - Ready for Attnys VIA WEBEX MOUNTAIN TIME Judge: Hung, Lung Shu |
|
October 04, 2023 |
Order - Protected Counsel Files Judge: Hung, Lung Shu |
||
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Witness Information |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer WF to Calendaring Q 07.03.23 |
|
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Special Findings Under ORCP 62 A |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition - Amended | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion - Time Extension | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Amended Petition Due 5.1.23 Judge: Hung, Lung Shu |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.