Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tami, Eleanor I, Aylworth, Matthew R, against Schiemer, Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Malheur County, OR, . Malheur County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2019 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMalheur County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Closed | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document Stipulated General Judgment and Money Award Judge: Landis, Erin |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing Mailed 04/29/2019 |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Arbitration - Eligible | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute Delivered to Marisa Carr 04/18/2019; Need Aff of Mailing |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.