Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bennett, Airon Scott, filed a(n) Post Conviction Relief case against Cain, Brad, in the jurisdiction of Malheur County, OR, . Malheur County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2016 |
CategoryPost Conviction Relief |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMalheur County, OR |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Appeal | |
July 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter From Bennett - re: dismissal cc: attorney |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document Dismissal Judge: Landis, Erin |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Closed | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order - Dismissal
Judge: Landis, Erin |
|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter From Bennett cc: Attorney Motion to dismiss hearing was 4/24/17 granted |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Motion SRCI SID#21037588 Video 30 minutes MST Motion to Dismiss Judge: Landis, Erin |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Record - Proceedings CR2 10:37-10:51 Mtn to Dismiss held in abeyance - Pet to file Church v Gladden Notice w/in 30 days - Then set for Church Hearing & Mtn to Dismiss |
|
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter to Ptf, not accept pro se filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.