Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Delafuente, Alicia Bertha, State Of Oregon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Hall, Amy S, against Long, Aaron David, in the jurisdiction of Malheur County, OR, . Malheur County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2014 |
CategoryDomestic Relations Petition Custody |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMalheur County, OR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document Stipulated Supplemental Judgment RE Custody Judge: Hung, Lung Shu |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check Parties close to stipulated judgment on 8/16; Respondent may appear by phone call 541-473-5171 Judge: Hung, Lung Shu |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Record - Proceedings CR2 10:40-10:45; Close to agreement, Status Check 09/20/2022 @ 10:00 |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Status Check - Status of Mediation (Full Agreement); Set hearing for Temp Order Judge: Landis, Erin |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement - Mediation | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Petitioner Response to the Motion RE: Order for Temporary Visitation |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion RE: Order for Temporary Visitation |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.