Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Moquin, Anton, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Holt, Kevin W, in the jurisdiction of Linn County, OR, . Linn County, OR Superior Courts Circuit with Brendan J. Kane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2024 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Tenant Actions |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLinn County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2024 |
Hearing - Status Check Set in Open Court / Status of Moving Personal Property / Court to Call Plaintiff at 541-401-2626 / 15 Minutes Judge: Kane, Brendan James |
||
April 30, 2024 |
Hearing - Pre-Trial Conference Status Check of Stipulated Agreement, No Appearance Dismiss, Non-Compliance Set for Trial Judge: (s) Landlord Tenant, Judge, Kane, Brendan James |
||
April 30, 2024 |
Order - Continue Continued to 5/1/24 for status check Judge: Kane, Brendan James |
||
April 22, 2024 |
Proof - Service mailed 4/22/24 |
||
April 22, 2024 | Affidavit/Declaration - Non-Compliance | ||
April 17, 2024 |
Order - Continue continued to PTC 4/30/24 Judge: Kane, Brendan James |
||
April 17, 2024 |
Hearing - Initial Appearance Tenant Action Judge: (s) Landlord Tenant, Judge, Kane, Brendan James |
||
April 09, 2024 |
Application - Fee Deferral Waiver FED1 - $88 |
||
April 09, 2024 |
Notice mailing complaint and summons |
||
April 09, 2024 | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.