Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tonkin, Todd, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Glantz, Rick, against Zerkel, Donald William, in the jurisdiction of Linn County, OR, . Linn County, OR Superior Courts with Daniel R. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2016 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLinn County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Authority, Administrative |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Closed | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order - Default
Judge: Murphy, Daniel R |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion - Default Order | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Intent Take Default | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof - Service | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.