Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Horizon Rentals, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Lane, Rachael, Lane, Teresa, in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, OR, . Lincoln County, OR Superior Courts with Amanda R. Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLincoln County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Notice - Judgment Entry | ||
August 04, 2023 |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
August 04, 2023 | Closed | ||
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: Buckley, Marcia |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof - Service | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Amended |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: Allison, Joseph C |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.