Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Devil'S Lake Road, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Yeoman-Millette, Tyler C, against Garrett, Toby Jon, Tanda, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, OR, . Lincoln County, OR Superior Courts Circuit with Amanda R. Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2023 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLincoln County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2024 |
Trial - Twelve Person Jury
Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
April 29, 2024 |
Hearing - Trial Readiness
Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
February 27, 2024 |
Order
Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
February 26, 2024 |
Hearing - Status Check Cont. Judge Benjamin:By video. https://oregonjudicial.webex.com/join/JudgeBenjaminBy telephone. Call 1 (503) 388-9555 Meeting Number 146 093 6967 followed by pound (#). Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
February 12, 2024 |
Hearing - Status Check To set trial dates Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
February 12, 2024 |
Order
Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
February 07, 2024 |
Trial - Twelve Person Jury
Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
February 02, 2024 |
Letter Email re: def requesting a 90-day extension |
||
January 09, 2024 |
Order 2-12-24 at 10:00am in 303 to set new trial dates Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
||
January 08, 2024 |
Hearing - Trial Readiness Cont; Mr. Garrett by phone Judge: Benjamin, Amanda R. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.