Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Southern Oregon Compost, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hayward, Jason D, against Guy, Keith, in the jurisdiction of Josephine County, OR, . Josephine County, OR Superior Courts with Michael Newman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2017 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJosephine County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Closed | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Newman, Michael |
|
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Support Attorney Fees | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion - Judgment | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof - Service | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order - Default
Judge: Cobb, Rita Batz |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Default Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.