Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thompson, Earl, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by De Alicante, Tony F, against Tofting, Kim, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, OR, . Jefferson County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2014 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJefferson County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Closed Post Conversion Addition for Reporting |
|
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Dickey, Don A |
|
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order - Default
Judge: Dickey, Don A |
|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Supporting Motion | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion - Judgment | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion - Default Order | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 91 Day | |
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof - Service | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice - Rule 7 - 63 Day |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.