Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Crompton, Jamie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wetlesen, Kai, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, OR, . Jackson County, OR Superior Courts with Benjamin M. Bloom presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2024 |
CategoryDissolution |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, OR |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 |
Hearing - Objection RSP's Objection to Venue, Motion to Transfer Case, and Motion to Reassign Case in the Alternative Judge: Bloom, Benjamin M |
||
April 22, 2024 |
Hearing - Evidentiary Motion
Judge: Bloom, Benjamin M |
||
April 22, 2024 |
Record - Proceedings HGEV 4/22/24 |
||
April 16, 2024 |
Hearing - Mediation KASTENBERG 4/16 |
||
April 16, 2024 | Mediation - No Agreement | ||
April 16, 2024 |
Objection BMB |
||
April 15, 2024 | Notice - Representation | ||
April 09, 2024 | Proof - Service | ||
April 01, 2024 | Motion - Mediation | ||
April 01, 2024 | Notice - Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.