Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Quick Collect Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mosley, Brandon, Mosley, Amanda Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2009 |
CategorySmall Claims Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Minute Order |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Judgment Debtor
Judge: Brady, Alta Jean |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notes - Correspondence Notes on left side of folder |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return - Service (Not Served) 6/2/22 Discontinued |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order - Appear of Jgmnt Debtor or Garnishee Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in support of |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for appearance |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service copy of notice of demand |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate - Extension Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.