Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chaparral Apartments, Income Property Management Co., filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Hernandez, Emmanuel, Hernandez, Heather, Other Occupants, And All, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts with Alycia M. Herriott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlycia M. Herriott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2023 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Return - Mail | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service POSTED: NORI |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service POSTED: NORI |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Restitution Issued MOVE OUT DATE 01/30/2023 |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum PROPOSED NORI |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document general judgment Judge: Herriott, Alycia M |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing - Initial Appearance
Judge: Herriott, Alycia M |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Declaration Non-Military | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof - Posting Public Notice POSTED ; SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.