Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anderson, Jocelyn, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Foreman, Jennyrae, against Obermoller, Jerry, represented by Mohill, Matthew L, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts with Beth M. Bagley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2022 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant - Residential Or Return Of Personal Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document Stipulated Supllmental Judgment Regarding Attorney Fees and Counterclaims Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document
Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Closed | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Witness List |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial - Court *1:30pm-4:30pm* Judge: Balyeat, Andrew C |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit & Exhibit List 112-114 |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum - Trial | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit WITNESS LIST |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - List & Exhibits #1-#6 |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - List & Exhibits #101 - #111 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.