Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aquino, Imelda A., Droesch, David C., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Pasco, Greta, Pasco, Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Michael S. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2008 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Time To Trial74 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions77 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Cycle Time94 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction 714130-Judgment: Satisfaction Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per JUDGMENT: SATISFACTION [714130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) 714120-Judgment: Notice of Entry Filed/Issued By: JUDGMENT: NOTICE OF ENTRY [714120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 711110-Hearing: Small Claims; Droesch, D. et al. vs. Pasco, M. et al. ; Judge: J21460 Williams Michael Judge: Williams, Michael |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 713610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [713610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Apr 18 2008 Type: 751110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 722110 - After Contested Hrg |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 712310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [712310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document: Other 721120-Plaintiffs Claim and Order to Def Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEF [721120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.