Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pyle, June M filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Michael P. Candela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2014 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time593 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Supervision Termination - Approval of Final Distribution | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: FINAL DISCHARGE Desc2: CONT FROM 10/27/15 Notice Date: 2015-10-27 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 947 - VACATED Disp Clerk: PBP Filing Clerk: PBP Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: FINAL DISCHARGE CONT FROM 10/27/15 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Final Discharge EX PARTE PETN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE & ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
|
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: FINAL DISCHARGE Notice Date: 2015-09-03 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 11/24/15 Disp Clerk: PBP Filing Clerk: PBP Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
October 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: FINAL DISCHARGE Disp Code: 948 - VACATED & RESET Disp Clerk: PBP Filing Clerk: BMK Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Distribution RECEIPT OF DAVID R STASEL OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF JUNE M PYLE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Distribution RECEIPT OF PATRICIA E LUMB OF FINAL DISTRIBU- TION OF ESTATE OF JUNE M PYLE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Receipt on Distribution RECEIPT OF ROCHELLE A HANSON OF FINAL DISTRIBU- TION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SWB |
|
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF RESCHEDULING FINAL DISCHARGE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PBP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.