Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nordyke, Dale R, against Easton, Michelle Paige, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2019 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Closed | |
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document General Judgment Dismissal without prejudice Judge: Flint, Bethany |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice - Dismissal | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter re: notice of intent to appear |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute By Heidi Easton |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Service | |
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Includes Consumer Debt Collection Disclosure |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Arbitration - Eligible |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.