Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anderson, Jonathan D, against Belmontes, Nicolas, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts with Raymond D. Crutchley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond D. Crutchley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2019 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction in full |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Garnishees Response GameStop |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Garnishees Response | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document General Jgmt and Money Award Judge: Miller, Walter R |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Continue as Pending Case and declaration |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Closed | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order - Continue 3.16.20 VACATED per RDC Judge: Crutchley, Raymond D. |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order - Default
Judge: Miller, Walter R |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Default Order and declaration |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion - Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.