Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Filer, Nicholas Ryan, against Smith, Tanner, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2019 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document General Jgmt of Dismissal with prejudice Judge: Crutchley, Raymond D. |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Closed | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice - Dismissal | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice - Dismissal | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Declaration - Mailing | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Substitute To Mackenzie Hatcher |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint **Breach of Contract** |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Service | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Arbitration - Eligible |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.