Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Smith, Jessica A, against Delery, Joann, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2015 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Return - Mail Notice of entry of judgment |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Closed | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Digitized Judgment Document Dismissal With Prejudice Judge: Flint, Bethany |
|
March 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Dismissal and Declaration |
|
February 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Rule 7 - 63 Day Electronic Notice sent to Atty JGDM due in 30 days |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.