Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ray Klein Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Salsbury, Megan E, against Vickers, Tina M, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2015 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 |
Garnishees Response Bimart |
||
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Garnishees Response Bimart |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Garnishees Response Bi-Mart |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Garnishees Response | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Garnishees Response | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Garnishees Response Bi-Mart Corporation |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Garnishees Response Bi-Mart Corporation |
|
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Closed | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Digitized Judgment Document | |
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.