Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Atlantic Credit & Finance Special Finance Unit, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Smith, Jessica A, against Niemann, Tracie, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts with Bethany Powers Flint presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2015 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Closed | |
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order - Default
Judge: Flint, Bethany |
|
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Digitized Judgment Document | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - Default Order and Declarations |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Statement - Costs & Disbursement | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Intent Take Default | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order - Rule 7 Appearance Postponement Granted GRANTED for 60 days Judge: Adler, A Michael |
|
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion - Time Extension and declaration |
|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Rule 7 - 91 Day Electronic Notice sent to Atty JGDM due in 30 days |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof - Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.