Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hensey, Kae, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ford, Susan S, against Lusk, Ronald, Rivals Sports Bar, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Deschutes County, OR, . Deschutes County, OR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDeschutes County, OR |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Judgment Entry | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Digitized Judgment Document | |
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Closed | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate of service |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Dismissal | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof - Service Office served by registered agent Ronald Lusk |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof - Service | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Service | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.