Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Perez, Eloyd V, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Kenneth J. Hara presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2009 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion Modification
Judge: Hara, Kenneth J |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.