Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Lorang, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2007 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedJune 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
September 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Order | |
June 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Order Filed | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.