Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Washington, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dept Of Child Support Services, against Gonzales, Genevie R, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2013 |
CategoryDcss Irfo |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 9999 | Docket Event | E-Case | |
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
November 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
September 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Law and Motion Filed- Modification | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Registration of Foreign Support Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.