Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cheyenne Irrevocable Trust Dated July 7, 2017, filed a(n) case against Susan Shaw, Tennie Robyn Dubry, Lee Togo Shaw, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts with Brandon S. Kinsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrandon S. Kinsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
REQUEST: Request
Date: October 25, 2021ORDER: Order
Date: October 21, 2021COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: July 21, 2021ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE: OF FILING
Date: October 25, 2021SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: July 21, 2021MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: October 25, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.