We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Raymond Conroy Plaintiff Vs Jeremiah Grande Et Al. Defendant

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

Raymond Conroy, filed a(n) Cv case against Jeremiah Grande, State Of Arizona, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with BRANDON KINSEY presiding.

Case Details for Raymond Conroy v. Jeremiah Grande , et al.

Judge

BRANDON KINSEY Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

December 29, 2020

Category

Cv

Last Refreshed

March 27, 2022

Filing Location

Yuma County, AZ

Filing Court House

Yuma County Superior

Parties for Raymond Conroy v. Jeremiah Grande , et al.

Plaintiffs

Raymond Conroy

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Defendants

Jeremiah Grande

State Of Arizona

Other Parties

Michael E Gottfried (Attorney)

Case Documents for Raymond Conroy v. Jeremiah Grande , et al.

MOTION: Dismiss

Date: April 12, 2021

SUMMONS: SUMMONS

Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT: IN SUPPORT OF

Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00

APPLICATION: FOR DEFERRAL OF FEES

Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00

ORDER: Granting

Date: June 07, 2021

ORDER: DEFERRING FEES

Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00

SERVICE: Certificate

Date: March 26, 2021

REPLY: Reply

Date: May 18, 2021

SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00

COMPLAINT: Complaint

Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00

MOTION: Motion

Date: June 01, 2021

ORDER: Recusing

Date: April 22, 2021

ORDER: Recusing

Date: May 18, 2021

Case Events for Raymond Conroy v. Jeremiah Grande , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER: Granting
Docket Event MOTION: Motion
Docket Event ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Docket Event REPLY: Reply
Docket Event ORDER: Recusing
Docket Event ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Docket Event ORDER: Recusing
Docket Event MOTION: Dismiss
Docket Event SERVICE: Certificate
Docket Event COMPLAINT: AMENDED COMPLAINT
See all events