Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yuma Palms Leaseco, filed a(n) Cv case against Regis Corp, D B A Mastercuts, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: September 14, 2020JUDGMENT: Judgment
Date: September 23, 2020SERVICE: Certificate
Date: September 22, 2020SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: September 14, 2020JUDGMENT: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 17, 2020AFFIDAVIT: ATTORNEY FEES
Date: September 21, 2020STATEMENT: of Costs
Date: September 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 21, 2020COMPLAINT: EVICTION ACTION (ENTRY)
Date: September 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.