Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Micah Custalow, filed a(n) Cv case against Yuma County Intergovernmental Public Transportation Authority Susan Thorpe, Ratp Dev America, Ratp Dev Usa, City Of Yuma Risk Management, City Of Yuma Richard W. Files, City Attorney, (total of 10) See All in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with BRANDON KINSEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRANDON KINSEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2020 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00STIPULATION: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: July 17, 2020NOTICE: Notice
Date: June 22, 2020ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: June 19, 2020NOTICE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: June 15, 2021ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: June 23, 2020CERTIFICATE: Certificate
Date: February 10, 2021ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00NOTICE: CHANGE OF FIRM / ADDRESS
Date: October 27, 2020NOTICE: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - CASE
Date: July 17, 2020ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: December 03, 2021ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: December 03, 2021SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2020-06-11T00:00:00COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00ORDER: Order
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00NOTICE: CHANGE OF JUDGE RULE 42(F)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.