Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Solar Covered Parking, Llc, filed a(n) Cv case against The Firm Of Shippen & Associates, P.C, Core Engineering Group, Pllc, Robert L. Campbell Structural Engineer,Pc, Malachite, Llc, Yuma Investment Group, Inc., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2020 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
MISCELLANEOUS: Attachments
Date: April 22, 2020ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: June 26, 2020ORDER: Order
Date: August 15, 2021ANSWER: AND COUNTERCLAIM
Date: June 16, 2020SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: April 22, 2020SERVICE: WAIVER OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2020NOTICE: Appearance
Date: January 20, 2021COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00STIPULATION: STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL
Date: January 20, 2021STIPULATION: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: August 09, 2021ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00ORDER: SETTING
Date: March 12, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.