Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America, filed a(n) Cv case against Barbara Ruth Richards, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON LARRY KENWORTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON LARRY KENWORTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
ARBITRATION: Peremptory Strike
Date: May 21, 2018STIPULATION: STIPULATION
Date: October 25, 2018NOTICE: Notice
Date: May 25, 2018SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00ARBITRATION: NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF CIVIL ARBITRATOR
Date: June 13, 2018JUDGMENT: Judgment
Date: October 26, 2018ARBITRATION: NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF CIVIL ARBITRATOR
Date: July 11, 2018ORDER: Granting
Date: June 25, 2018ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00JUDGMENT: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 03, 2020COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: April 04, 2018SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00ARBITRATION: NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF CIVIL ARBITRATOR
Date: April 25, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.