Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Andrew James Neliton, filed a(n) Cv case against Ag West Logistics Llc, Rudy Mireles, Eric Mireles, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON ROGER NELSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2016 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
SERVICE: Certificate
Date: August 16, 2019SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL
Date: March 19, 2018SERVICE: Certificate
Date: March 14, 2018ORDER: Order
Date: May 23, 2018MOTION: Continue
Date: July 16, 2018ORDER: Order
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00MOTION: Motion
Date: August 20, 2018ORDER: AMENDED ORDER
Date: April 11, 2018MOTION: Quash
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00RESPONSE: RESPONSE
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00ORDER: Approving
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00MOTION: Continue
Date: May 22, 2018ORDER: VACATING
Date: August 21, 2018ORDER: AMENDED ORDER
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00PETITION: Petition
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00MOTION: Appear Telephonically
Date: 2017-03-23T00:00:00WARRANT: QUASHED
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00WARRANT: ORDERED
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00WARRANT: ISSUED
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00CORRESPONDENCE: Returned Mail
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00NOTICE: Notice
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00NOTICE: Lodging
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00ORDER: WITHDRAW COUNSEL
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00PETITION: Petition
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00MOTION: WITHDRAW
Date: 2017-01-25T00:00:00ORDER: Order
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00MOTION: Quash
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00RESPONSE: RESPONSE
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00ORDER: Order
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00ORDER: Quashing
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00ORDER: Order
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00APPLICATION: APPLICATION
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00STATEMENT: of Costs
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00NOTICE: Hearing
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00MISCELLANEOUS: EXHIBIT LIST
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE
Date: 2017-02-07T00:00:00APPLICATION: FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00ORDER: Resetting
Date: July 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT OF A PERSON
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00SERVICE: Proof of Service
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00JUDGMENT: Judgment
Date: 2016-10-21T00:00:00ORDER: SETTING
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT OF A PERSON
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00NOTICE: Notice
Date: 2017-06-08T00:00:00MOTION: Continue
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00STATEMENT: of Facts
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00MOTION: SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: 2016-07-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.