Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Cv case against Gabriela Yanez, Sergio Yanez, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON ROGER NELSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
NOTICE: Hearing on Default
Date: April 28, 2016AFFIDAVIT: IN SUPPORT OF
Date: February 16, 2016ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS SUBJECT TO
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00ORDER: Order
Date: May 04, 2016MOTION: Motion
Date: March 10, 2016JUDGMENT: Default
Date: June 13, 2016NOTICE: Entry of Default
Date: February 16, 2016SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 28, 2016ORDER: Order
Date: March 16, 2016SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: February 16, 2016COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00MOTION: Appear Telephonically
Date: May 12, 2016AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2016-01-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.