Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David W Cowles, filed a(n) Cv case against Yuma County Treasurers Office, David Egeberg, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON ROGER NELSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2015 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: November 16, 2015ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: November 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT: AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 15, 2016ORDER: Releasing
Date: January 20, 2016APPLICATION: APPLICATION
Date: January 15, 2016APPLICATION: FOR EXCESS PROCEEDS
Date: December 09, 2015SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: November 16, 2015CERTIFICATE: Certificate
Date: December 24, 2015SERVICE: Certificate
Date: November 18, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.