Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gabriel Armendariz, filed a(n) Cv case against City Of Yuma, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON DAVID HAWS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON DAVID HAWS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2015 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
NOTICE: Association of Counsel
Date: June 10, 2015ORDER: Reassignment of Judge
Date: June 22, 2015MOTION: Continue Trial
Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00NOTICE: Hearing
Date: July 09, 2015NOTICE: CHANGE OF JUDGE UPON REQUEST RULE 10.2
Date: June 10, 2015REQUEST: Request
Date: August 28, 2015MOTION: VACATE
Date: September 29, 2015ORDER: Continuing
Date: June 11, 2015PETITION: Clearance of Record
Date: 2015-04-21T00:00:00NOTICE: Appearance
Date: 2015-06-08T00:00:00ORDER: Assigning to Presiding Judge for Reassignment
Date: June 16, 2015ORDER: VACATING
Date: October 06, 2015OBJECTION: OPPOSITION TO
Date: August 28, 2015NOTICE: Hearing
Date: 2015-05-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.