Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Wakefield And Associates Inc, filed a(n) Cv case against Adriana Campos, Mario Campos, in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON DAVID HAWS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON DAVID HAWS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 17, 2015 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
APPLICATION: CONTINUING LIEN
Date: August 14, 2018ORDER: Continuing Lien
Date: August 28, 2018Order: Release of Garnishment
Date: April 15, 2019CORRESPONDENCE: Correspondence
Date: October 16, 2018APPLICATION: FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 11, 2017MOTION: RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT
Date: April 15, 2019NOTICE: Notice
Date: June 05, 2018JUDGMENT: TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT
Date: March 17, 2015NOTICE: Appearance
Date: November 15, 2016ANSWER: OF GARNISHEE
Date: June 05, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.