Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Richard L Kumlin, filed a(n) Cv case against Angela A Gallardo, Allen Smith, Joaquin Gustavo Corral, Carolyn Mcintosh, Cynthia Kayle, (total of 26) See All in the jurisdiction of Yuma County, AZ, . Yuma County, AZ Superior Courts Yuma County Superior with HON DAVID HAWS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON DAVID HAWS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2014 |
CategoryCv |
Last RefreshedJanuary 22, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationYuma County, AZ |
|
Filing Court HouseYuma County Superior |
STIPULATION: STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL
Date: May 29, 2015ORDER: Order
Date: June 01, 2015CERTIFICATE: OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2015CERTIFICATE: OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2015ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00NOTICE: Entry of Default
Date: February 09, 2015APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: February 09, 2015CERTIFICATE: OF SERVICE
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: DEFAULT
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00REQUEST: Request
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00ORDER: Granting
Date: 2014-10-22T00:00:00NOTICE: Entry of Default
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00APPLICATION: ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE: Notice
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00CERTIFICATE: OF SERVICE
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00MOTION: STRIKE
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00APPLICATION: FOR DEFAULT
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00SERVICE: ACCEPTANCE
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: DEFAULT
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00NOTICE: Filing Application
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE
Date: 2014-09-10T00:00:00ANSWER: ANSWER
Date: 2014-08-26T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: DEFAULT
Date: February 10, 2015CERTIFICATE: OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2015SUMMONS: SUMMONS
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00NOTICE: SETTLEMENT
Date: May 22, 2015COMPLAINT: Complaint
Date: 2014-07-21T00:00:00JUDGMENT: Judgment
Date: June 12, 2015NOTICE: Appearance
Date: 2014-10-03T00:00:00MOTION: Motion
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00SERVICE: Certificate
Date: 2014-09-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE: OF SERVICE
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00RESPONSE: TO MOTION
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00SERVICE: Proof of Service
Date: 2014-09-10T00:00:00SERVICE: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00ANSWER: AMENDED ANSWER
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00APPLICATION: FOR DEFAULT
Date: 2014-10-27T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: DEFAULT
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00ANSWER: AMENDED ANSWER
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT: DEFAULT
Date: 2014-10-07T00:00:00CERTIFICATE: OF SERVICE
Date: 2014-12-09T00:00:00ARBITRATION: CERTIFICATE OF COMPULSORY ARBITRATION - IS NOT SUBJECT TO
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.